SC S0126 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-21 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-21 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Enacting The "charter School Accountability Act"; By Amending Section 59-40-30, Relating To The Intent Of The General Assembly In The Charter Schools Act, So As To Include Provisions Concerning Governance And Accountability; By Amending Section 59-40-40, Relating To Definitions Concerning Charter Schools, So As To Revise Definitions; By Amending Section 59-40-55, Relating To Charter School Powers And Duties, So As To Include Provisions Concerning Governance And Accountability; By Amending Section 59-40-75, As Amended, Relating To The Removal Of Charter School Governing Body Members And Sponsors, So As To Remove References To The South Carolina Public Charter School District And Make Certain Provisions Applicable To Sponsors; By Amending Section 59-40-115, Relating To The Termination Of Sponsor Contracts By Charter Schools, So As To Revise Criteria For Voluntary Terminations And Provide Procedures And Requirements For Transfers To Other Sponsors; By Amending Section 59-40-150, Relating To Duties Of The State Department Of Education Concerning Charter Schools, So As To Include Provisions Concerning Charter School Sponsors; And By Amending Section 59-40-180, Relating To The Promulgation Of Regulations Concerning Charter Schools By The Department, So As To Provide Requirements Concerning Sponsors And Revise Other Requirements.
Title
Charter School Accountability Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4944 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 40 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 180 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 75 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |