SC S0127 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Create The South Carolina Brain Injury Leadership Council, To Provide For Duties Of The Council, To Provide For Qualifications And Membership Of The Council, And To Repeal Section 44-20-225 Relating To Consumer Advisory Boards For Individuals With Certain Intellectual Disabilities And Brain And Spinal Cord Injuries
Title
Brain Injury Leadership Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Motion To Carry Over (Y: 15 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 18 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Motion To Carry Over (Y: 15 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 18 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Act No. 63 | |
2013-06-20 | Effective date 06/13/13 | |
2013-06-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-06-11 | Ratified R 76 | |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2013-06-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-05-30 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2013-05-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-8 |
2013-05-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-05-29 | House | Amended |
2013-05-28 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-29-13 |
2013-05-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-05-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2013-05-02 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-02-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-02-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |