SC S0151 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Roll call Yeas-41 Nays-61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Roll call Yeas-41 Nays-61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Qualifications For A Commercial Driver's License, To Establish The Intrastate Vision Waiver Program, To Provide That Certain Visually Impaired Individuals May Obtain A Waiver From The Sight Requirements Associated With A Commercial Driver's License, And To Provide For The Waiver's Eligibility Requirements For The Waiver, The Circumstances Under Which A Waiver May Granted, And The Procedures For Obtaining A Waiver.
Title
Commercial driver's license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 41 N: 61 NV: 18 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | Roll call Yeas-41 Nays-61 |
2014-02-19 | House | Rejected |
2014-02-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-19-14 |
2014-01-15 | House | Debate adjourned until Thurs., 1-16-14 |
2013-06-05 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2013-05-30 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-02-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |