SC S0167 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-17 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rose, Shoopman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-17 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rose, Shoopman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increase The Penalty To Life Without Parole Or Death If The State Seeks The Death Penalty For Murder.
Title
Homicide by child abuse
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Fair [R] | Sen. Michael Rose [R] | Sen. Greg Ryberg [R] | Sen. Phillip Shoopman [R] |
Sen. Danny Verdin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-17 | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rose, Shoopman | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-01 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3491 (Similar To) 2012-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0167&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/167_20101201.htm |