SC S0167 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expand Applicability Of The Requirement To Include Offers To Sell Hearing Aids Through Mail, Internet, Or Other Means; To Revise An Exclusion For Businesses That Employ Licensees To Also Include Businesses That Contract With Licensees To Sell And Fit Hearing Aids; To Provide That Nothing In This Chapter Prohibits A Person From Engaging In The Business Of Selling Or Offering For Sale Hearing Aids Through The Mail, Internet, Or Other Means To Distributors, Dealers, Or Other Persons Engaged In The Practice Of Specializing In Hearing Aids That Are Licensed In This State; And To Provide That Nothing In This Chapter Prohibits The Sale Of Hearing Aids Through The Mail, Internet, Or Any Other Means If The Sale Is Made Pursuant To The Direct Prescribed Recommendation Of A Person Holding An Unsuspended, Unrevoked License Issued By The Department Pursuant To This Chapter.
Title
Hearing aids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-5 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |