SC S0230 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Act No. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Act No. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adjust The Membership And Composition Of The Board
Title
Clarendon County Board of Elections and Voter Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Act No. 9 | |
2013-04-19 | Effective date 04/12/13 | |
2013-04-12 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-04-09 | Ratified R 13 | |
2013-03-22 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2013-03-21 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2013-03-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2013-03-21 | House | Read second time |
2013-03-20 | House | Recalled from Clarendon Delegation |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Clarendon Delegation |
2013-03-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |