SC S0241 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 187
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 187
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Chapter 84 To Title 40 So As To Provide For The Regulation Of Genetic Counselors, To Establish The Board Of Genetic Counselors, To Provide Powers And Duties Of The Board, To Define Necessary Terms, To Provide Procedures And Criteria For Licensure Of Genetic Counselors, To Provide Related Duties Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, To Provide For The Investigation Of Violations And Imposition Of Penalties, And To Provide Certain Exemptions From The Provisions Of This Chapter, Among Other Things; And Provide For The Establishment And Adjustment Of Various Related Fees, Subject To Certain Limitations. - Ratified Title
Title
Genetic Counselors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Act No. 187 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date 05/21/24 | |
2024-05-21 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-15 | Ratified R 180 | |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2024-05-09 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2024-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-15 |
2024-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2024-05-08 | House | Amended |
2024-05-07 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2024-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-24 |
2024-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-6 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |