SC S0287 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 40-45-220, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Qualifications For Licensure By The Board Of Physical Therapy Examiners, And Section 40-45-240, Relating To Applicants For Licensure By Endorsement For Licensees From Other Jurisdictions, Both So As To Require Certain Fingerprint-supported State And National Criminal Records Checks For Initial Licensure Applicants, To Provide The Results Of These Records Checks Must Be Provided To The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, To Authorize The State Law Enforcement Division To Retain Fingerprints For Certain Purposes, To Provide Applicants Must Bare Related Costs, And To Provide The Department Shall Keep Information Received Pursuant To This Act Confidential, Subject To An Exception. - Ratified Title
Title
Physical Therapy Examiners, license qualifications and licensure by endorsement from other jurisdictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Act No. 6 | |
2021-03-17 | Effective date 03/15/21 | |
2021-03-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-03-11 | Ratified R 7 | |
2021-03-10 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-03-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-118 Nays-1 |
2021-03-09 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3327 (Similar To) 2021-02-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins