SC S0290 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-25 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-25 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Definitions And To Require Coverage Of Telemedicine Services By Individual And Group Health Maintenance Organizations.
Title
Telemedicine Insurance Reimbursement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Raymond Cleary [R] | Sen. Bradley Hutto [D] | Sen. Greg Hembree [R] | Sen. Thomas Davis [R] |
Sen. Thomas Alexander [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-04-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-04-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3779 (Similar To) 2013-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry