SC S0302 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Before August 1, 2018, And As Later Considered Necessary Through The Cyclical Review Process, The Board Also Shall Include Certain Instruction On Prescription Opioid Abuse Prevention And Make Available To Districts A List Of Instructional Materials That Meet Applicable State Standards, And To Provide Districts Shall Continue To Adopt Or Develop Curriculum Locally
Title
Physical education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 22 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 91 NV: 22 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 22 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 91 NV: 22 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 185 | |
2018-05-24 | Effective date 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 201 | |
2018-05-10 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Conference report adopted |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-2 |
2018-05-10 | House | Conference report adopted |
2018-05-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Felder, B Newton, Alexander |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Sheheen, Bennett, Hembree |
2018-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-91 |
2018-05-09 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2018-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-05-09 | House | Amended |
2018-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2018-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-08 | House | Amended |
2018-05-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-8-18 |
2018-05-03 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2018-05-02 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-05-02 | House | Amended |
2018-05-02 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2018-05-01 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-04-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Amended |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3071 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Education
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 103 | 155 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 103 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 29 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 32 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |