SC S0356 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Act No. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Act No. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Define Terms, To Make Grammatical Corrections, To Provide That To Be Qualified For A Notarial Commission, A Person Must Be Registered To Vote And Read And Write In The English Language, To Authorize And Prohibit Certain Acts Of A Notary Public, To Provide The Maximum Fee A Notary May Charge, To Provide The Process For Giving A Notarial Certificate, To Specify Changes For Which A Notary Must Notify The Secretary Of State, To Provide The Elements And Penalties Of Certain Crimes Relating To Notarial Acts, And To Provide The Form For A Notarized Document Sent To Another State, Among Other Things
Title
Notaries Public
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Act No. 185 | |
2014-06-06 | Effective date 06/02/14 | |
2014-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified R 208 | |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2014-05-21 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2014-05-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2014-05-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-20 | House | Amended |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Gregory (ch), Sheheen, S.Martin |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3722 (Similar To) 2014-04-15 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary