SC S0356 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require That On The Effective Date Of This Act Recognized Native American Indian Groups Continue To Be Recognized And Eligible To Exercise Privileges And Obligations Authorized By That Designation, That The Commission For Minority Affairs Cease To Recognize Additional Native American Indian Groups, That Any Regulations Providing For Recognition As A Native American Indian Group Are Repealed, And That The Commission Revise Its Regulations To Provide For The Privileges And Obligations Of Native American Indian Groups That Continue To Be Recognized.
Title
Commission for Minority Affairs
Sponsors
Sen. Luke Rankin [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Thurmond, Sabb |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4820 (Similar To) 2016-02-03 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary