SC S0394 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Add The South Carolina Retirement Investment Commission Members And The South Carolina Public Benefit Authority Members; And To Repeal Sections 9-4-45, 9-8-170, 9-9-160, 9-10-80, And 9-11-250 Relating To Policy Determinations And The Custody Of Funds For The Retirement System For Judges And Solicitors, The Retirement System For Members Of The General Assembly, The National Guard Retirement System, And The Police Officers Retirement System.
Title
SC Retirement system
Sponsors
Sen. Vincent Sheheen [D] | Sen. Darrell Jackson [D] | Sen. Floyd Nicholson [D] | Sen. John Scott [D] |
Sen. Sean Bennett [R] | Sen. Michael Gambrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Special order, set for February 23, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2017-02-17 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 3 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 1085 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 1320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 10 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 11 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 11 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 16 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 16 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 16 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 16 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 16 | 335 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 16 | 380 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 16 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 4 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 4 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 4 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 8 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 9 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |