SC S0500 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 38-75-485, Relating To The South Carolina Hurricane Damage Mitigation Program, So As To Establish Grant Criteria, Establish A Nonmatching Grant Formula, And To Remove A Cap On The Amount Of The Grant; By Amending Section 38-3-110, Relating To Duties Of The Director Of The Department Of Insurance, So As To Allow The Director To Provide Information Regarding Factors That May Affect Premium Rates; By Amending Section 38-73-1085, Relating To The Publication Of Representative Sample Premiums, So As To Allow The Director Or His Designee To Make Available Information That Affects Private Passenger Premium Rates; By Amending Section 38-61-80, Relating To Withdrawing From The Market, So As To Require Notice To The Director By The Insurer; And By Amending Section 38-1-20, Relating To The Definition Of "surplus Lines Insurance", So As To Include A Reference To Commercial Motor Vehicle Liability. - Ratified Title
Title
Department of Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Act No. 29 | |
2023-05-25 | Effective date 05/16/23 | |
2023-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Ratified R 36 | |
2023-05-05 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2023-05-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2023-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0 |
2023-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-02-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3746 (Similar To) 2023-01-19 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 1 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 3 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 61 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 73 | 1085 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 75 | 485 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |