SC S0510 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to Subcommittee: Cash (ch), M.B.Matthews, Talley
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to Subcommittee: Cash (ch), M.B.Matthews, Talley
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 20-3-170 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Modification, Confirmation, Or Termination Of Alimony, To Provide Factors For The Court To Consider When Determining The Existence Of Changed Circumstances, To Provide That Retirement By The Supporting Spouse Is Sufficient Grounds To Warrant A Hearing If So Moved By A Party, To Evaluate Whether Alimony Should Be Modified Or Terminated In Amount Or Term And To Provide Factors For The Court To Consider, And To Provide That Payment Of Alimony For A Period That Exceeds The Duration Of Marriage Constitutes Sufficient Grounds For The Court To Modify, Terminate, Or Establish A Fixed Duration Of Time For Any Further Payment Obligation, If Supported By The Evidence Presented.
Title
Alimony
Sponsors
Sen. Chauncey Gregory [R] | Sen. Sean Bennett [R] | Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] | Sen. Ross Turner [R] |
Sen. Ronnie Cromer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Cash (ch), M.B.Matthews, Talley |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0508 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Referred to Subcommittee: Cash (ch), M.B.Matthews, Talley
S0511 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3271 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
H3787 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
S0511 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3271 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
H3787 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0510&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/510_20190213.htm |