SC S0520 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Article 18 Of Chapter 71, Title 38, Relating To Pharmacy Audit Rights, So As To Expand The Rights And Duties Of Pharmacies During Audits; By Amending Article 21 Of Chapter 71, Title 38, Relating To Pharmacy Benefits Managers, So As To Define Terms And Make Conforming Changes; By Adding Article 23 To Chapter 71, Title 38 So As To Define Terms And Outline Responsibilities And Duties Of Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations; And By Repealing Section 38-71-147 Relating To Freedom Of Selection And Participation In Health Insurance Policies Or Health Maintenance Organization Plans. - Ratified Title
Title
Pharmacy benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Act No. 30 | |
2023-05-26 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2023-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Ratified R 37 | |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2023-05-05 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2023-05-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2023-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-0 |
2023-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |