SC S0522 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Declare August 14-21, 2017, As "immunization Week" In South Carolina And To Seek To Increase The Population's Awareness Of The Importance Of Receiving Vaccinations.
Title
Immunization Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |