SC S0577 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Unfair Trade Practices, By Adding Article 7, To Enact The "pyramid Promotional Scheme Prohibition Act", To Provide That Pyramid Promotional Schemes Constitute Unfair Trade Practices Under The South Carolina Unfair Trade Practices Act And To Provide Necessary Definitions; And To Repeal Section 39-5-30, Relating To Pyramid Clubs And Similar Operations.
Title
Pyramid Promotional Scheme Prohibition Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-04-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |