SC S0599 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Act No. 123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Act No. 123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Rename The Center The G. Frank Russell Technology Center, And To Make A Technical Correction Reducing The Membership Of The Technology Center's Advisory Committee From Seven Members To Six Members Due To The Dissolution Of The Greenwood County Board Of Education Pursuant To Act 175 Of 1997
Title
G. Frank Russell Career Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | Act No. 123 | |
2015-05-13 | Effective date 05/07/15 | |
2015-05-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Ratified R 26 | |
2015-04-23 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-04-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-71 Nays-0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-21 | House | Recalled from Greenwood Delegation |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Greenwood Delegation |
2015-04-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |