SC S0621 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Act No. 121
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Act No. 121
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Chapter 79 To Title 39 So As To Create The "south Carolina-ireland Trade Commission", To Provide For The Members Of The Trade Commission, And To Establish The Duties Of The Commission. - Ratified Title
Title
SC Ireland Trade Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - House: Table Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 19 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - House: Table Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 19 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Act No. 121 | |
2024-05-20 | Effective date 05/13/24 | |
2024-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Ratified R 129 | |
2024-05-03 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-05-02 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-16 |
2024-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Amended |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-01-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4135 (Similar To) 2023-05-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott