SC S0623 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize February 25 Through March 3, 2019, As "eating Disorders Awareness Week" In The State Of South Carolina, To Coincide With National Eating Disorders Awareness Week, And To Recognize Friday, March 1, 2019, As "eating Disorders Awareness Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Eating Disorders Awareness Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-04-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Polled out of committee Medical Affairs |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced |