SC S0627 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-545, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Income Tax Rates For Pass-through Trade And Business Income, So As To Create An Election To Tax Certain Partnerships And "s" Corporations At The Entity Level. - Ratified Title
Title
Pass through trade and business income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 61 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/17/21 | |
2021-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 75 | |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2021-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-05-12 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2021-05-11 | House | Read second time |
2021-05-11 | House | Amended |
2021-05-11 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2021-05-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-11-21 |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3978 (Similar To) 2021-02-24 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means