SC S0636 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Add The "new Hope" Precinct, To Designate A Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Office Of Research And Statistics Of The State Budget And Control Board, And To Correct Archaic Language
Title
Oconee County New Hope precinct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Act No. 52 | |
2013-06-18 | Effective date 06/07/13 | |
2013-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-06-04 | Ratified R 61 | |
2013-05-17 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2013-05-16 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2013-05-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-0 |
2013-05-16 | House | Read second time |
2013-05-15 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Oconee Delegation |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Oconee Delegation |
2013-04-30 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |