SC S0704 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For A Return To Five-day, In-person Classroom Instruction For The 2020-2021 And 2021-2022 School Years, To Suspend The Earnings Limitation Under Certain Terms And For Certain Members Of The South Carolina Retirement System, And To Provide Requirements Concerning Dual-modality Instruction For The 2021-2022 School Year. - Ratified Title
Title
SCRS, earning limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number Rfh-1 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number Rfh-1 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Act No. 102 | |
2021-04-26 | Effective date 04/22/21 | |
2021-04-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-22 | Ratified R 33 | |
2021-04-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2021-04-15 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-7 |
2021-04-14 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-14 | House | Amended |
2021-04-13 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |