SC S0710 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-29 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-29 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Motor Vehicles Bestow Special Recognition Upon Congressional Medal Of Honor Recipients Colonel Charles Murray, Jr., Corporal Freddie Stowers, Major General James E. Livingston, Sergeant First Class Webster Anderson, Master Sergeant John Baker, Jr., And Seaman Robert Blake, And The Wives Of Colonel Charles Murray, Jr., Major General James E. Livingston And Master Sergeant John Baker, Jr., By Naming Department Of Motor Vehicles' Buildings In Their Honor.
Title
Congressional Medal of Honor
Sponsors
Sen. John Scott [D] | Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Lawrence Grooms [R] | Sen. Robert Hayes [R] |
Sen. Glenn Reese [D] | Sen. John Courson [R] | Sen. Floyd Nicholson [D] | Sen. Thomas Alexander [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2013-05-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-05-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2013-05-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2013-05-22 | House | Introduced |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Introduced |