SC S0717 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-16)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Proclaim September 2023 As "childhood Cancer Awareness Month" In The State Of South Carolina And To Encourage All South Carolinians To Support This Cause That So Deeply Impacts Families In Every Community Across The State And Nation.
Title
Childhood Cancer Awareness Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-04-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Introduced |