SC S0728 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 163
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 163
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 23-9-197, Relating To The "firefighter Cancer Health Care Benefit Plan", So As To Provide That The Definition Of "firefighter" Shall Include Nonresidents Of South Carolina Who Work In The State, And To Provide That The Plan Provides A Supplemental Insurance Policy Upon A Firefighter Being Diagnosed With Cancer On Or After July 1, 2021. - Ratified Title
Title
Firefighter residency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Act No. 163 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date 05/20/24 | |
2024-05-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-15 | Ratified R 189 | |
2024-05-08 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-05-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2024-05-07 | House | Read second time |
2024-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-24 |
2024-05-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-2-24 |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4680 (Similar To) 2024-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary