SC S0777 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Permits To Purchase And Sell Beer And Wine For On-premises Consumption And A Biennial License To Purchase Alcoholic Liquors By The Drink At A Motorsports Entertainment Complex, Tennis Specific Complex, Or Baseball Complex, To Include Soccer Complex And To Provide A Definition For "soccer Complex."
Title
Permits for alcohol at motorsport and tennis events
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Senn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-25 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Shealy (ch), Hutto, Senn |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |