SC S0871 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of United States Highway 25 From Its Intersection With South Carolina Highway 291 To Its Intersection With Lenhart Road In Greenville County "dr. S. C. Cureton Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Highway That Contain The Words "dr. S. C. Cureton Memorial Highway".
Title
Dr. S. C. Cureton Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-05-04 | Introduced | |
2011-05-04 | Adopted, sent to House | |
2011-05-03 | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |