SC S0872 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 245
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 245
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reauthorize The Committee Through December 31, 2023, And To Delete Obsolete Provisions
Title
Joint Citizens and Legislative Committee on Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Act No. 245 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/06/14 | |
2014-06-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 274 | |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2014-05-21 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2014-05-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2014-05-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-20 | House | Amended |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Coleman (ch), Shealy, Turner |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled |