SC S0872 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Death By Electrocution Or Lethal Injection, To Provide That A Person Convicted Of A Capital Crime And Having Imposed Upon Him The Sentence Of Death Shall Suffer The Penalty By Electrocution Or, At The Election Of The Person, Lethal Injection, If It Is Available At The Time Of Election, Under The Direction Of The Director Of The Department Of Corrections, To Provide That The Penalty Must Be Administered By Electrocution For A Person Who Waives The Right Of Election, And To Provide That If Execution By Lethal Injection Under This Section Is Unavailable Or Is Held To Be Unconstitutional By An Appellate Court Of Competent Jurisdiction, Then The Manner Of Inflicting A Death Sentence Must Be Electrocution Regardless Of The Method Elected By The Person.
Title
Executions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Motion To Carry Over The Bill (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Motion To Carry Over The Bill (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-26 Nays-12 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amended |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Special order, set for February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Corrections and Penology |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4615 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tallon