SC S0881 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Chapter 28 To Title 27 So As To Enact The "prohibition Of Unfair Real Estate Service Agreements Act"; And To Make The Prohibitions Effective For Any Unfair Real Estate Service Agreements That Are Recorded On The Effective Date Of This Act Or That Are Executed, Modified, Extended, Or Amended On Or After The Effective Date Of This Act. - Ratified Title
Title
Prohibition of Unfair Real Estate Service Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Act No. 165 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2024-05-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-15 | Ratified R 191 | |
2024-05-09 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2024-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2024-05-07 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2024-05-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-02-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: M.Johnson (ch), Sabb, Talley, Reichenbach, Devine |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |