SC S0910 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Campsen, Johnson, Gambrell, Talley
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Campsen, Johnson, Gambrell, Talley
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To The Salaries Of Supreme Court Justices And Court Of Appeals, Circuit Court, And Family Court Judges, To Provide For A Salary Schedule For Those Judges; To Amend Section 1-7-325 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Solicitor Compensation, To Provide That Each Full-time Circuit Solicitor Shall Earn A Salary Not Less Than The Salary Paid To A Circuit Court Judge For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year; To Amend Section 14-11-30 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Master-in-equity Compensation, To Provide For A Pay Schedule Based On The Salary Paid To A Circuit Court Judge For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year; To Amend Section 17-3-510(c) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Circuit Public Defenders, To Provide That The Circuit Public Defender For Each Judicial Circuit Must Earn A Salary Not Less Than The Salary Paid To A Circuit Court Judge For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year; To Amend Sections 22-8-40(b)(2) And (3) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Full-time And Part-time Magistrate Salaries, To Provide For A Pay Schedule Based On The Salary Paid To A Circuit Court Judge For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year; To Amend Section 42-3-40 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Salaries Of Workers' Compensation Commissioners, To Provide That The Annual Salary For Each Commissioner Shall Be Eighty-five Percent Of The Salary Paid To A Circuit Court Judge For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year;
Title
Solicitor compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Campsen, Johnson, Gambrell, Talley |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4801 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S1122 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S1122 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 7 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 11 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 3 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 8 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
42 | 3 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0910&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/910_20180123.htm |