SC S0951 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution Memorializing Congress To Authorize A Pilot Program Between The States Of Georgia, South Carolina, And North Carolina Granting Commercial Driver's License Holders Between The Ages Of Eighteen And Twenty-one The Right To Operate In Interstate Commerce And To Haul Interstate Commodities Within And Between These States.
Title
Congress
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
H4960 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Introduced and adopted