SC S0986 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 250
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 250
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Points Associated With Certain Violations
Title
Hunting, fishing, or trapping
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Act No. 250 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/06/14 | |
2014-06-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 281 | |
2014-06-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2014-06-04 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2014-05-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-1 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2014-05-20 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2014-05-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2014-05-14 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-14 | House | Amended |
2014-05-13 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-14-14 |
2014-04-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-6-14 |
2014-04-02 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2014-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-03-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-02-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |