SC S0995 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 16-15-375, Relating To Definitions Applicable To Sections 16-15-385 Through 16-15-425, So As To Define Identifiable Minor And Morphed Image; By Amending Section 16-15-395, Relating To First Degree Sexual Exploitation Of A Minor, So As To Include Morphed Images Of Identifiable Children As An Offense; By Amending Section 16-15-405, Relating To Second Degree Sexual Exploitation Of A Minor, So As To Include Morphed Images Of Identifiable Children As An Offense; By Amending Section 16-15-410, Relating To Third Degree Sexual Exploitation Of A Minor, So As To Include Morphed Images Of Identifiable Children As An Offense; And By Amending Section 23-3-430, Relating To The Sex Offender Registry, So As To Include Those Guilty Of Criminal Sexual Exploitation Of A Minor In The First, Second, Or Third Degree As A Tier Ii Offender.
Title
MPIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-02-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rice, Senn, Adams, Tedder |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4948 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4973 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell, Yow
H4973 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell, Yow
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 15 | 375 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 385 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 395 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 3 | 430 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |