SC S1024 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Act No. 175
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Act No. 175
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND SECTION 12-37-220, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTIONS, SO AS TO ALLOW THE SURVIVING SPOUSE OF A DECEDENT WHO WAS ELIGIBLE FOR THE EXEMPTION OF THE DWELLING OWNED BY A PERSON WITH CERTAIN SPECIFIC ILLNESSES CAUSING THE SAME AMBULATORY DIFFICULTIES AS PERSONS WITH PARAPARESIS OR HEMIPARESIS. - ratified title
Title
Allow The Surviving Spouse Of A Decedent Who Was Eligible For The Exemption Of The Dwelling Owned By A Person With Certain Specific Illnesses Causing The Same Ambulatory Difficulties As Persons With Paraparesis Or Hemiparesis. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Act No. 175 | |
2010-05-26 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2010-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Ratified R 209 | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time and enrolled HJ-21 | |
2010-05-05 | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-2 HJ-27 | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time HJ-27 | |
2010-05-04 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, May 5, 2010 HJ-68 | |
2010-04-27 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, May 4, 2010 HJ-61 | |
2010-04-22 | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means HJ-40 | |
2010-04-13 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-26 | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-26 | |
2010-03-30 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-9 | |
2010-03-25 | Read second time SJ-38 | |
2010-03-24 | Committee report: Favorable Finance SJ-9 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-59 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and read first time SJ-59 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1024&session=118 |