SC S1031 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 213
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 213
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 30-5-5, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Office Of Register Of Deeds, So As To Provide Qualifications For Eligibility To Serve Or Continue To Serve As A Register Of Deeds, And To Provide Quo Warranto Actions May Be Brought To Determine The Eligibility Of A Person To Seek Or Continue To Serve As A Register Of Deeds; To Amend Section 30-5-90, Relating To The Time Within Which A Register Of Deeds Shall Record Certain Instruments, So As To Provide Such A Register Of Deeds Shall File Such Instruments Within Thirty Days After Its Lodgment; To Provide Certain Provisions Of This Act Do Not Apply To Persons Who Hold The Office Of Register Of Deeds On The Effective Date Of This Act And During His Tenure In Office; And To Provide Affirmative Defense To Quo Warranto Actions Brought Pursuant To This Act. - Ratified Title
Title
Register of deeds
Sponsors
Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Lawrence Grooms [R] | Sen. Sandra Senn [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] |
Sen. Danny Verdin [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Waive Rule 32a (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Act No. 213 | |
2022-06-01 | Effective date 06/22/22 | |
2022-05-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-18 | Ratified R 241 | |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2022-05-12 | House | House recedes from amendment |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2022-05-12 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-1 |
2022-05-11 | House | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2022-05-10 | House | Amended |
2022-05-05 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Sabb, Senn, M.Johnson, Stephens |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |