SC S1031 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Act No. 218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Act No. 218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Chapter 11 Of Title 35, Relating To Anti-money Laundering, So As To Incorporate The Uniform Money Services Act, To Protect The Public From Financial Crime, Standardize The Types Of Activities That Are Subject To Licensing, And Modernize Safety And Soundness Requirements To Ensure Funds Are Protected In An Environment That Supports Innovative And Competitive Business Practices. - Ratified Title
Title
Uniform Money Services Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 92 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 101 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 71 N: 37 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 101 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 71 N: 37 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-17 | Act No. 218 | |
2024-07-17 | Effective date 07/02/24 | |
2024-07-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-06-27 | Ratified R 243 | |
2024-06-26 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2024-06-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-16 |
2024-06-26 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2024-05-09 | House | Conference committee appointed Blackwell, Gatch, Jefferson |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Malloy, Gambrell, Garrett |
2024-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-101 |
2024-05-09 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2024-05-02 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2024-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-71 Nays-37 |
2024-05-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-05-01 | House | Amended |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-03-28 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H5068 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry