SC S1110 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Welcome The Sumter School District Teacher Forum To The South Carolina State House And To Proclaim April 7, 2014, "sumter Teacher Forum Celebration Of Excellence Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Sumter Teacher Forum Celebration of Excellence Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Introduced |