SC S1113 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Committed to delegation from Fairfield County SJ-2
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Committed to delegation from Fairfield County SJ-2
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND ACT 191 OF 1991, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE FAIRFIELD COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, SO AS TO REVISE THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES, TO REVISE COMPENSATION OF BOARD MEMBERS, TO PROVIDE FOR THE FILLING OF VACANCIES, TO PROVIDE FOR THE ABOLITION OF CERTAIN BOARD SEATS UPON CERTAIN CONDITIONS, AND TO REQUIRE THE SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD AND SUPERINTENDENT TO COOPERATE WITH NEWLY APPROVED BOARD MEMBERS.
Title
Revise The Membership Of The Board Of Trustees, To Revise Compensation Of Board Members, To Provide For The Filling Of Vacancies, To Provide For The Abolition Of Certain Board Seats Upon Certain Conditions, And To Require The School District Board And Superintendent To Cooperate With Newly Approved Board Members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Committed to delegation from Fairfield County SJ-2 | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Reconsidered SJ-2 | |
2010-02-11 | Recalled from House SJ-2 | |
2010-01-29 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-2 | |
2010-01-28 | Read second time SJ-9 | |
2010-01-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-01-27 | Unanimous consent for second and third readings on next two consecutive legislative days SJ-6 | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar SJ-6 |
Same As/Similar To
H4432 (Similar To) 2010-09-09 - Act No. 309
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1113&session=118 |