SC S1232 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Requesting The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Fairfield Street In The Town Of Winnsboro In Fairfield County From Its Intersection With Truman Street To The Adult Center For Education "t.e. Greene Street" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Containing These Words.
Title
T.E. Greene Memorial Street
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-04-30 | House | Introduced |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2024-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced |