SC S1312 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-27
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-27
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO APPROVE REGULATIONS OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION, RELATING TO REQUIREMENTS FOR ADDITIONAL AREAS OF CERTIFICATION, DESIGNATED AS REGULATION DOCUMENT NUMBER 4117, PURSUANT TO THE PROVISIONS OF ARTICLE 1, CHAPTER 23, TITLE 1 OF THE 1976 CODE.
Title
Approve Regulations Of The State Board Of Education, Relating To Requirements For Additional Areas Of Certification, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4117, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-27 | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-27 | |
2010-03-31 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-16 | |
2010-03-30 | Read second time SJ-12 | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference SJ-4 |
Same As/Similar To
H4807 (Similar To) 2010-09-09 - Act No. 333
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1312&session=118 |