SC S175 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-153
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-153
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY REPEALING SECTIONS 4-10-810 AND 59-21-1030 RELATING TO THE LEVEL OF FINANCIAL EFFORT PER PUPIL REQUIRED OF EACH SCHOOL DISTRICT.
Title
By Repealing Sections 4-10-810 And 59-21-1030 Relating To The Level Of Financial Effort Per Pupil Required Of Each School District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-153 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time SJ-153 | |
2008-12-10 | Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-12-10 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0395 (Similar To) 2009-02-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-6
H3181 (Similar To) 2009-02-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
H3724 (Similar To) 2009-05-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Horne, A.D.Young
H4247 (Similar To) 2010-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-45
H3181 (Similar To) 2009-02-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
H3724 (Similar To) 2009-05-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Horne, A.D.Young
H4247 (Similar To) 2010-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-45
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=0175&session=118 |