SC S3 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-73
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-73
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 1-1-696, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE STATE'S OFFICIAL LANGUAGE, SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT AFTER JULY 1, 2009, ALL STATE AGENCIES AND POLITICAL SUBDIVISIONS OF THE STATE SHALL OFFER ALL SERVICES, PUBLICATIONS, PRINTED, AUDIO AND VIDEO MATERIALS, AND TEST IN AN ENGLISH-ONLY FORMAT, UNLESS OTHERWISE REQUIRED BY FEDERAL LAW OR REGULATION, AND TO PROVIDE EXCEPTIONS.
Title
Provide That After July 1, 2009, All State Agencies And Political Subdivisions Of The State Shall Offer All Services, Publications, Printed, Audio And Video Materials, And Test In An English-only Format, Unless Otherwise Required By Federal Law Or Regulation, And To Provide Exceptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Bright [R] | Sen. Kevin Bryant [R] | Sen. Dick Elliott [D] | Sen. Shane Martin [R] |
Sen. Glenn McConnell [R] | Sen. William O'Dell [R] | Sen. Michael Rose [R] | Sen. Phillip Shoopman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-73 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time SJ-73 | |
2008-12-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2008-12-10 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3771 (Similar To) 2009-03-25 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-56
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=0003&session=118 |