TN HB0273 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the division of health related boards to hire a medical consultant. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 252 | |
2023-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0221 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023