TN HB0337 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "The Small Estate Probate Act," makes various changes to "The Small Estate Affidavit Limited Letter of Authority Act" and replaces that act. - Amends TCA Title 30, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 30, Chapter 4, relative to small estates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2023 | |
2023-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 297 | |
2023-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0390) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0109) |
2023-03-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0489 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 297