TN HB0443 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes an obsolete provision that temporarily prohibited a municipality from annexing territory by ordinance and required a review and evaluation of annexation laws. - Amends TCA Title 6 and Title 64.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 6 and Title 64, relative to municipal boundaries.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0206 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-25 - Sponsor change.