TN HB0444 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises requirements in state law where an SAT score is explicitly stated to account for the change in scoring on the revised SAT exams. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-702 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, revises requirements in state law where an SAT score is explicitly stated to account for the change in scoring on the revised SAT exams. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-702 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 328 | |
2017-05-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0394 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 328