TN HB0444 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from July 1 to January 31, the deadline by which the bureau of workers' compensation must annually review the impact of the Workers' Compensation Reform Act of 2013 on the workers' compensation system in this state and deliver a report of its findings to each member of the general assembly; requires the bureau to provide a presentation of its findings to certain committees. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56, relative to workers’ compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1562 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee